Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roman Pindel

Bishop of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1958 Born
22 May 198324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
16 Nov 201354.9AppointedBishop of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland
6 Jan 201455.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland

MicroData Summary for Roman Pindel
Bishop Roman Pindel (born ) Bishop of Bielsko-Żywiec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOświęcim
Ordained BishopSaint Nicolas, Cathedral, Bielsko Biala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bielsko-Żywiec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 4 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,067

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast