Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Rakoczy

Bishop Emeritus of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1938 Born
23 Jun 196325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
25 Mar 199253.9AppointedBishop of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland
26 Apr 199254.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland
16 Nov 201375.6RetiredBishop of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Rakoczy
Bishop Tadeusz Rakoczy (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bielsko-Żywiec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGilowice

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bielsko-Żywiec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,673
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast