Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Józef Chrząszcz

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Forconium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1969 Born
8 May 199323.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 May 199424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
11 Nov 202051.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
11 Nov 202051.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Forconium
6 Feb 202151.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forconium

MicroData Summary for Robert Józef Chrząszcz
Bishop Robert Józef Chrząszcz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWadowice, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained DeaconSts. Stanislaus and Wenceslaus, Cathedral Basilica, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained PriestSts. Stanislaus and Wenceslaus, Cathedral Basilica, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained Bishopśw. Jana Pawła II, Shrine, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 24 Dec 2020
  • c34: CB, 2 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast