Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Santiago De Wit Guzmán

Apostolic Nuncio to Central African Republic

Titular Archbishop of Gabala

Apostolic Nuncio to Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1964 Born
27 May 198924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
21 Mar 201752.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Central African Republic
21 Mar 201752.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gabala
25 Mar 201752.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chad
10 Jun 201752.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gabala

MicroData Summary for Santiago De Wit Guzmán
Father Santiago De Wit Guzmán (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Central African Republic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia, Spain
Ordained BishopValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia, Spain

Please contact the Father through the Nunciature to Central African Republic.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 13 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017