Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlos Cardinal Osoro Sierra

Archbishop of Madrid

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Ordinary of Spain, Faithful of Eastern Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1945 BornCastañeda
29 Jul 197328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santander, Spain
27 Dec 199651.6AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
22 Feb 199751.7Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
7 Jan 200256.6AppointedArchbishop of Oviedo, Spain
8 Jan 200963.6AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
18 Apr 200963.9InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
28 Aug 201469.2AppointedArchbishop of Madrid, Spain
25 Oct 201469.4InstalledArchbishop of Madrid, Spain
9 Jun 201671.0AppointedOrdinary of Spain, Faithful of Eastern Rites
19 Nov 201671.5Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201671.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

MicroData Summary for Carlos Osoro Sierra (VIAF: 86895703)
Carlos Cardinal Osoro Sierra (born ) Archbishop of Madrid

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Madrid.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,928
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Aug 2014
  • i: CB, 8 Sep 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2016
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Nov 2016