Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Santos Montoya Torres

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Madrid, Spain

Titular Bishop of Horta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1966 Born
18 Jun 200033.9Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
29 Dec 201751.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
29 Dec 201751.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Horta
17 Feb 201851.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horta

MicroData Summary for Santos Montoya Torres
Father Santos Montoya Torres (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Madrid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolana, Territorial Prelature of Ciudad Real
Ordained BishopSanta María la Real de la Almudena, Cathedral, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Madrid.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018