Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Vidal Chamorro

Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain

Titular Bishop of Elepla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1974 Born
8 May 200430.0Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
29 Dec 201743.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
29 Dec 201743.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Elepla
17 Feb 201843.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elepla

MicroData Summary for Jesús Vidal Chamorro
Bishop Jesús Vidal Chamorro (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Madrid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Madrid
Ordained BishopSanta María la Real de la Almudena, Cathedral, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Madrid.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Dec 2017
  • c34: CB, 17 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,679

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast