Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Cobo Cano

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Madrid, Spain

Titular Bishop of Beatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1965 Born
23 Apr 199428.5Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
29 Dec 201752.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
29 Dec 201752.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Beatia
17 Feb 201852.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Beatia

MicroData Summary for José Cobo Cano
Father José Cobo Cano (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Madrid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSobiote, Diocese of Jaén
Ordained BishopSanta María la Real de la Almudena, Cathedral, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Madrid.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018