Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Leonardo Lemos Montanet

Bishop of Orense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1953 BornBarallobre
19 May 197926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
16 Dec 201158.5AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
11 Feb 201258.7Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Leonardo Lemos Montanet:
Bishop José Leonardo Lemos Montanet (born ) Bishop of Orense

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orense.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Dec 2011
  • c3+: CB, 27 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013