Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Diéguez Reboredo

Bishop Emeritus of Tui-Vigo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1934 BornSan Miguel de Enquerentes
13 Aug 196127.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 198450.4AppointedBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
28 Oct 198450.5Ordained BishopBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
15 May 198753.1AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
7 Jun 199662.1AppointedBishop of Tui-Vigo, Spain
28 Jan 201075.8RetiredBishop of Tui-Vigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Diéguez Reboredo:
Bishop José Diéguez Reboredo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tui-Vigo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tui-Vigo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013