Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aquilino Cardinal Bocos Merino, C.M.F.

Superior General Emeritus of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia del Gonfalone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1938 Born
15 Aug 195618.2ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
15 Aug 195921.2Perpetual VowsMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
23 May 196325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
1991²52.6AppointedSuperior General of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
2003²64.6ResignedSuperior General of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
31 May 201880.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Urusi
16 Jun 201880.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Urusi
28 Jun 201880.1Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201880.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia del Gonfalone

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aquilino Bocos Merino (VIAF: 87855345)
Aquilino Cardinal Bocos Merino C.M.F. (born ) Superior General Emeritus of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanillas de Esgueva, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain
Ordained PriestSalamanca, Diocese of Salamanca, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Antonio María Claret, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid, Spain

Please contact the Cardinal through the Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ob/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Jun 2018
  • ab: CB, 16 Jun 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Jun 2018

Quantcast