Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ricardo Blázquez Pérez

Archbishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1942 BornVillanueva del Campillo
18 Feb 196724.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 198846.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
8 Apr 198846.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
29 May 198846.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
26 May 199250.1AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
8 Sep 199553.4AppointedBishop of Bilbao, Spain
13 Mar 201067.9AppointedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Blázquez Pérez:
Archbishop Ricardo Blázquez Pérez (born ) Archbishop of Valladolid

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Valladolid.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,721

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Dec 2014