Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Simón Conesa Ferrer

Bishop of Menorca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1961 Born
29 Sep 198524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain
27 Oct 201655.1AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
7 Jan 201755.3Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Simón Conesa Ferrer (VIAF: 46933912)
Bishop Francisco Simón Conesa Ferrer (born ) Bishop of Menorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlicante
Ordained BishopCathedral, Menorca, Diocese of Menorca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Menorca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2016
  • ob: CB, 30 Oct 2016
  • c2+: CB, 11 Nov 2016
  • c34: CB, 7 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jan 2017