Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Murgui Soriano

Bishop of Orihuela-Alicante


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1946 BornValencia
21 Sep 196923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
25 Mar 199649.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
25 Mar 199649.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
11 May 199650.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
27 Dec 200357.7AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
21 Feb 200457.8InstalledBishop of Mallorca, Spain
27 Jul 201266.3AppointedBishop of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain
29 Sep 201266.4InstalledBishop of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jesús Murgui Soriano:
Bishop Jesús Murgui Soriano (born ) Bishop of Orihuela-Alicante

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orihuela-Alicante.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,748
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2012
  • i: CB, 30 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013