Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Valera Sánchez

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1960 Born
18 Sep 198323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cartagena (en España)
30 Oct 202060.6AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
12 Dec 202060.7Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Valera Sánchez
Bishop Fernando Valera Sánchez (born ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBullas, Diocese of Cartagena (en España)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zamora, Diocese of Zamora

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zamora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2020
  • ob: CB, 30 Oct 2020
  • c2+: CB, 10 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Dec 2020

Quantcast