Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Vadell Ferrer

Auxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain

Titular Bishop of Urci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1972 Born
31 May 199826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mallorca, Spain
19 Jun 201745.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
19 Jun 201745.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Urci
9 Sep 201745.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urci

MicroData Summary for Antoni Vadell Ferrer
Bishop Antoni Vadell Ferrer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLlucmajor, Diocese of Mallorca
Ordained Bishopla Sagrada Familia, Basilica, Barcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Barcelona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 20 Jun 2017
  • c34: CB, 29 Aug 2017
  • c45: CB, 9 Sep 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,521

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast