Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián Taltavull Anglada

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1948 Born
23 Sep 197224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Menorca, Spain
28 Jan 200961.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
28 Jan 200961.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabii
21 Mar 200961.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabii
8 Sep 201668.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mallorca, Spain
19 Sep 201769.6AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
25 Nov 201769.8InstalledBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Taltavull Anglada (VIAF: 73311552)
Bishop Sebastián Taltavull Anglada (born ) Bishop of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudadela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mallorca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,071
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 20 Sep 2017