Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Moncadas Noguera

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1921BornMuro
5 Oct 194726.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 196847.2AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
2 Feb 196947.4Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
1 Apr 197755.5AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
5 Aug 198967.9DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Moncadas Noguera:
Bishop Miguel Moncadas Noguera (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013