Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan José Omella Omella

Archbishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1946 Born
20 Sep 197024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Zaragoza, Spain
15 Jul 199650.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
15 Jul 199650.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasabe
22 Sep 199650.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sasabe
29 Oct 199953.5AppointedBishop of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain
24 Aug 200155.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Huesca, Spain
19 Oct 200155.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jaca, Spain
19 Dec 200357.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Huesca, Spain
21 Dec 200357.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Jaca, Spain
8 Apr 200457.9AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain
6 Nov 201569.5AppointedArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
26 Dec 201569.6InstalledArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
28 Jun 201771.1Elevated to Cardinal

MicroData Summary for Juan José Omella Omella (VIAF: 87626328)
Archbishop Juan José Omella Omella (born ) Archbishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCretas, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Pilár, Cathedral Basilica, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Barcelona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,849
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2015
  • card: CB, 21 May 2017
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017