Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Florencio Roselló Avellanas, O. de M.

Archbishop-Elect of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1962 Born
15 Aug 198018.5First VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
7 Dec 198523.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
21 Dec 198523.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
24 Aug 198624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
9 Nov 202361.8AppointedArchbishop of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain
27 Jan 202462.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Pamplona y Tudela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Florencio Roselló Avellanas
Father Florencio Roselló Avellanas O. de M. (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Pamplona y Tudela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcorisa, Diocese of Teruel (-Albarracín)
Ordained DeaconLa Merced, Basilica, Barcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona
Ordained PriestAlcorisa, Diocese of Teruel y Albarracín
Ordained BishopSanta María la Real, Cathedral, Pamplona, Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Pamplona y Tudela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2023
  • od/c01/ob/loc: CB, 9 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 11 Nov 2023