Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Daniel Palau Valero

Bishop-Elect of Lleida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1972 Born
23 Nov 200330.9Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
21 May 202552.4AppointedBishop of Lleida, Spain
19 Jul 202552.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lleida, Spain

MicroData Summary
Daniel Palau Valero
Father Daniel Palau Valero
(born )
Bishop-Elect of Lleida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lleida, Diocese of Lleida

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Lleida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2025
  • op/ob: CB, 21 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 21 May 2025