Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Giménez Valls

Bishop of Lleida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1948 Born
9 Jun 197325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
11 May 200556.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
11 May 200556.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abula
2 Jul 200557.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abula
21 May 200960.9AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
28 Jul 201567.1AppointedBishop of Lleida, Spain
20 Sep 201567.3InstalledBishop of Lleida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Giménez Valls
Bishop Salvador Giménez Valls (born ) Bishop of Lleida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuro di Alcoy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lleida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,909
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2015
  • i: CB, 8 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018