Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Iceta Gavicagogeascoa

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1965 Born
16 Jul 199429.3Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Spain
5 Feb 200842.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bilbao, Spain
5 Feb 200842.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Alava
12 Apr 200843.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alava
24 Aug 201045.4AppointedBishop of Bilbao, Spain
11 Oct 201045.5InstalledBishop of Bilbao, Spain
6 Oct 202055.5AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
5 Dec 202055.7InstalledArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mario Iceta Gavicagogeascoa (VIAF: 66758412)
Archbishop Mario Iceta Gavicagogeascoa (born ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGernika, Diocese of Bilbao
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bilbao, Diocese of Bilbao

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Burgos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2008
  • ob/c1: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,726
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2020
  • i: CB, 6 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 7 Oct 2020

Quantcast