Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseba Segura Etxezarraga

Auxiliary Bishop of Bilbao, Spain

Titular Bishop of Basti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1958 Born
4 Jan 198526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bilbao, Spain
12 Feb 201960.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bilbao, Spain
12 Feb 201960.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Basti
6 Apr 201960.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basti

MicroData Summary for Joseba Segura Etxezarraga
Bishop Joseba Segura Etxezarraga (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bilbao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilbao, Diocese of Bilbao
Ordained BishopSantiago, Cathedral, Bilbao, Diocese of Bilbao

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bilbao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2019
  • ob: CB, 12 Feb 2019
  • c2: CB, 19 Feb 2019
  • c34: CB, 6 Apr 2019
  • c34: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Apr 2019

Quantcast