Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cecilio Raúl Berzosa Martínez

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1957 Born
8 Nov 198224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Burgos, Spain
22 Mar 200547.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oviedo, Spain
22 Mar 200547.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcavica
14 May 200547.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcavica
2 Feb 201153.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
9 Apr 201153.3InstalledBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
16 Jan 201961.1ResignedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cecilio Raúl Berzosa Martínez
Bishop Cecilio Raúl Berzosa Martínez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAranda de Duero
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oviedo, Archdiocese of Oviedo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Rodrigo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,888
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Jan 2019

Quantcast