Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Gil Hellín

Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1940 Born
21 Jun 196423.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 199655.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Family
3 Apr 199655.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Citium
1 Jun 199655.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citium
28 Mar 200261.7AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
30 Oct 201575.3RetiredArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
15 Jun 201877.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
16 Jan 201978.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gil Hellín
Archbishop Francisco Gil Hellín (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurcia
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Burgos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,756
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2015
  • ab: CB, 15 Jun 2018
  • r: CB, 16 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Jan 2019

Quantcast