Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vicente Jiménez Zamora

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1944 BornÁgreda
29 Jun 196824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Osma-Soria, Spain
21 May 200460.3AppointedBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
17 Jul 200460.5Ordained BishopBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
27 Jul 200763.5AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
12 Dec 201470.9AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
21 Dec 201470.9InstalledArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Jiménez Zamora:
Archbishop Vicente Jiménez Zamora (born ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Zaragoza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,655
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2014
  • i: CB, 12 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Dec 2014