Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Melgar Viciosa

Bishop of Ciudad Real


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1948 BornCervatos de la Cueza
20 Jun 197324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Palencia, Spain
1 May 200859.6AppointedBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
6 Jul 200859.7Ordained BishopBishop of Osma-Soria, Spain
8 Apr 201667.5AppointedBishop of Ciudad Real, Spain
21 May 201667.6InstalledBishop of Ciudad Real, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Melgar Viciosa
Bishop Gerardo Melgar Viciosa (born ) Bishop of Ciudad Real

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Real.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,780
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2016
  • i: CB, 8 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Apr 2016