Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand Guy Richard Appora-Ngalanibé, O.P.

Bishop of Bambari, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1972 Born
2001²28.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Nov 200432.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Dec 201644.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bambari, Central African Republic
25 Mar 201744.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bambari, Central African Republic
28 Apr 201745.0SucceededBishop of Bambari, Central African Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bertrand Guy Richard Appora-Ngalanibé (VIAF: 313249753)
Bishop Bertrand Guy Richard Appora-Ngalanibé O.P. (born ) Bishop of Bambari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBangui, Archdiocese of Bangui
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l’Immaculée Conception, Cathedral, Bangui, Archdiocese of Bangui

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bambari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2016
  • ob: CB, 20 Jan 2017
  • fn/ob: CB, 22 Feb 2017
  • c2: CB, 23 Mar 2017
  • c4: CB, 27 Mar 2017
  • c3: CB, 29 Mar 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,354
  • s: CB, 28 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 May 2017