Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyr-Nestor Yapaupa

Bishop of Alindao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1970 BornBangassou
18 Mar 200131.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bangassou, Central African Republic
18 Dec 200434.8IncardinatedPriest of Alindao, Central African Republic
14 May 201242.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alindao, Central African Republic
22 Jul 201242.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Alindao, Central African Republic
19 Mar 201444.1SucceededBishop of Alindao, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Cyr-Nestor Yapaupa:
Bishop Cyr-Nestor Yapaupa (born ) Bishop of Alindao

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alindao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 May 2012
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,507
  • s: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Mar 2014