Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Berbérati

Dioecesis Berberatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dennis Kofi Agbenyadzi, S.M.A., Bishop
  • Agostino Giuseppe Delfino, O.F.M. Cap., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bangui
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Central African Republic
  • Square Kilometers: 44,000 (16,995 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 22, Berberati, Rep. Centraficaine

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Berbérati
28 May 1940ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Vicariate Apostolic of Oubangui Chari
Prefecture Apostolic of Berbérati (erected)
9 January 1947Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Berbérati
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Prefecture Apostolic of Fort-Lamy (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Berbérati
13 March 1952ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Berbérati Vicariate Apostolic of Berbérati
Diocese of Berbérati
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Berbérati Diocese of Berbérati
9 February 1959Territory LostDiocese of Berbérati Prefecture Apostolic of Bossangoa (erected)
27 February 1978Territory LostDiocese of Berbérati Diocese of Bouar (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Berbérati
195015,00017,25087.0%25256001410ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Berbérati
Diocese of Berbérati
195725,446440,0005.8%3232795632ap1960
196934,540405,0008.5%53540863495613ap1971
198029,200232,53012.6%819271,081362810ap1981
199055,120287,00019.2%1211232,396202019ap1991
199972,274353,39120.5%2113342,125213220ap2000
200073,935362,22520.4%2012322,310223220ap2001
200173,935362,22520.4%2112332,240223220ap2002
200275,000362,22520.7%1910292,586173020ap2003
200375,000362,22520.7%2011312,419203320ap2004
200475,000362,22520.7%1414282,678212920ap2005
200678,400384,00020.4%2411352,240183516ap2007
2012114,000427,00026.7%237303,800102518ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013