Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Giuseppe Delfino, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Berbérati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1935 BornArenzano
19 Sep 195924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Jun 199156.0AppointedBishop of Berbérati, Central African Republic
27 Oct 199156.4Ordained BishopBishop of Berbérati, Central African Republic
17 Jun 201075.0RetiredBishop of Berbérati, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Agostino Giuseppe Delfino:
Bishop Agostino Giuseppe Delfino O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Berbérati

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Berbérati.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,610

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013