Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse-Célestin-Basile Baud, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Berbérati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1908BornBellevaux, France
29 Jun 193425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Apr 195445.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Berbérati, Central African Republic
10 Apr 195445.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Risinium
24 Jun 195445.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Risinium
14 Sep 195546.9AppointedBishop of Berbérati, Central African Republic
2 Jun 197970.7ResignedBishop of Berbérati, Central African Republic
19 Apr 198172.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Berbérati, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Célestin-Basile Baud:
Bishop Alphonse-Célestin-Basile Baud O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Berbérati

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013