Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-Toussaint-Jean-Clément Chambon, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bossangoa, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1905Born
20 Aug 193327.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Dec 195954.1AppointedPrefect of Bossangoa, Central African Republic
16 Jan 196458.2AppointedBishop of Bossangoa, Central African Republic
1 May 196458.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bossangoa, Central African Republic
22 Apr 197872.4ResignedBishop of Bossangoa, Central African Republic
9 Oct 198781.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Bossangoa, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Léon-Toussaint-Jean-Clément Chambon
Bishop Léon-Toussaint-Jean-Clément Chambon O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bossangoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pierre-du-Champ, France

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018