Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pierre Joseph François d’Alcantara Sintas, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Berbérati, Central African Republic

Titular See: (Pietro Alcantara da Habas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1904Born
28 Mar 194136.5AppointedPrefect of Berbérati, Central African Republic
1952²47.3ResignedPrefect of Berbérati, Central African Republic
28 Sep 197369.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Berbérati, Central African Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Joseph François d’Alcantara Sintas
Father Pierre Joseph François d’Alcantara Sintas O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Berbérati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHabas, France

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast