Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Tranquillo Silvestri, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Khartoum

Titular Bishop of Ierichus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1876BornLivigno Valtellina
1 Jun 190024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
29 Oct 192448.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Khartoum, Sudan
5 Nov 192448.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierichus
7 Dec 192448.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierichus
Jul 1930³54.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Khartoum, Sudan
22 Jan 194972.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Khartoum, Sudan

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Tranquillo Silvestri:
Bishop Paolo Tranquillo Silvestri F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Khartoum

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1950
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013