Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ignacij Knoblehar (Knobleher)

Deceased

Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1819Born
9 Mar 184525.6Ordained PriestPriest
1848²28.4AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan
13 Apr 185838.7DiedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignacij Knoblehar (Knobleher) (VIAF: 54952295)
Father Ignacij Knoblehar (Knobleher) (born , died ) Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŠkocjan, Slovenia
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 13.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast