Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Makurdi

Dioecesis Makurdensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Athanasius Atule Usuh, Bishop
  • Wilfred Chikpa Anagbe, C.M.F., Coadjutor Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 28 June 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Abuja
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 7,304 (2,821 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 21, 42 Kashim Ibrahim Road, Makurdi, Benue State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (044)533.613
  • Fax: 532.919

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Benue
9 July 1934ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale} Prefecture Apostolic of Benue (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo
18 April 1950Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Benue Prefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo
14 July 1950Territory LostDiocese of Buéa
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo
Prefecture Apostolic of Yola (erected)
21 February 1955Territory LostDiocese of Benin City
Diocese of Kaduna
Prefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kabba (erected)
Diocese of Oturkpo
2 April 1959ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Oturkpo Diocese of Oturkpo
Diocese of Makurdi
28 June 1960Name ChangedDiocese of Oturkpo Diocese of Makurdi
10 July 1995Territory LostDiocese of Makurdi Diocese of Otukpo (erected)
5 December 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Jos
Diocese of Makurdi
Diocese of Lafia (erected)
29 December 2012Territory LostDiocese of Makurdi Diocese of Gboko (erected)
29 December 2012Territory LostDiocese of Makurdi Diocese of Katsina-Ala (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Makurdi
197047,4312,641,9601.8%4242845644624ap1971
1980224,0003,200,0007.0%2847752,98652574ap1981
1990627,5114,703,00013.3%78421205,22947904ap1991
19991,160,1403,400,31334.1%122141368,530599664ap2000
20001,072,8552,510,00042.7%13961457,3997853ap2001
20011,077,2352,780,11038.7%11081189,129567956ap2002
20021,105,2802,780,11039.8%112111238,986586544ap2003
20031,177,9662,905,34140.5%117171348,790646947ap2004
20041,380,7903,005,56845.9%116612211,317546658ap2005
2012457,0701,014,00045.1%84845,441303327bul:29Dec2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014