Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donal Joseph Murray, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Makurdi, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1918Born
7 Apr 194628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
11 Jan 196849.9AppointedBishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
29 Mar 196850.1Ordained BishopBishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
2 Jun 198971.3ResignedBishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
14 Aug 199981.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Makurdi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Donal Joseph Murray
Bishop Donal Joseph Murray C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Makurdi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Ireland

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018