Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brian Charles Foley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lancaster, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1910Born
25 Jul 193727.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
26 Apr 196251.9AppointedBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 196252.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
22 May 198574.9RetiredBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 199989.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lancaster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Brian Charles Foley (VIAF: 23648498)
Bishop Brian Charles Foley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lancaster

EventPlace
Birth Place44 Ripley Road, Ilford, Essex, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Lancaster, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Death PlaceNazareth House, Lancaster, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, St. Peter, Cathedral, Lancaster, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 76
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 93
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast