Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Hagan, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Makurdi, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1904Born
28 Oct 192824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
20 Mar 194843.9AppointedPrefect of Benue, Nigeria
8 Mar 196055.9AppointedBishop of Oturkpo, Nigeria
8 May 196056.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oturkpo, Nigeria
29 Mar 196662.0ResignedBishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
29 Mar 196662.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
7 Dec 197066.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
12 Dec 197672.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Makurdi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for James Hagan
Bishop James Hagan C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Makurdi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeadgate, Consett, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady and St. Joseph, Church, Leadgate, Consett, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 46
  • loc: CL, 13 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast