Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Minna

Dioecesis Minnaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Martin Igwe Uzoukwu, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 17 September 1973
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kaduna
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 56,229 (21,718 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 33, 11 Ahmadu Bello Rd., Minna, Niger State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (066)221.046
  • Fax: 22.29.87

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Minna
9 November 1964ErectedArchdiocese of Kaduna Prefecture Apostolic of Minna (erected)
Diocese of Minna
17 September 1973ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Minna Diocese of Minna
6 November 1981Territory LostDiocese of Minna Mission "Sui Iuris" of Abuja (erected)
15 December 1995Territory LostDiocese of Ilorin
Diocese of Minna
Diocese of Sokoto
Prefecture Apostolic of Kontagora (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Minna
19705,7961,339,137.4%27272143268ap1971
Diocese of Minna
198015,8181,320,0001.2%21820790209ap1981
199041,4692,074,0002.0%713202,0731314ap1991
199954,1202,122,0002.6%209291,866153125ap2000
200055,0702,182,0002.5%2011311,776184525ap2001
200156,0202,065,6582.7%248321,750154525ap2002
200256,5712,071,2092.7%258331,714144525ap2003
200357,0302,365,6592.4%427491,16374527ap2004
200465,8582,267,1072.9%419501,31794530ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 14 Oct 2012