Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luka Sylvester Gopep

Auxiliary Bishop of Minna, Nigeria

Titular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1965 Born
31 Jan 199832.5Ordained PriestPriest of Minna, Nigeria
9 Dec 202055.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Minna, Nigeria
9 Dec 202055.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena
20 Feb 202155.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena

MicroData Summary for Luka Sylvester Gopep
Bishop Luka Sylvester Gopep (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Minna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalin Nemel
Ordained BishopSt. Michael's, Cathedral, Minna, Diocese of Minna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Minna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2020
  • ob: CB, 2 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast