Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Joseph Fitzgibbon, S.P.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Warri, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1925Born
9 Apr 195025.1Ordained PriestPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
25 Nov 196439.7AppointedPrefect of Minna, Nigeria
17 Sep 197348.5ResignedPrefect of Minna, Nigeria
20 Nov 197550.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Port Harcourt, Nigeria
20 Nov 197550.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Warri, Nigeria
20 Nov 197550.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Traiani
6 Jan 197650.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Traiani
31 Aug 199166.4AppointedBishop of Warri, Nigeria
3 Mar 199772.0ResignedBishop of Warri, Nigeria
17 Apr 201085.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Warri, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Edmund Joseph Fitzgibbon
Bishop Edmund Joseph Fitzgibbon S.P.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Warri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallylegan, Ireland

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018