Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Giusti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Nisibis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1814Born
22 Feb 186752.6AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
22 Apr 186752.8Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
5 Dec 189177.4ResignedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
14 Dec 189177.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
31 Mar 189782.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Abuja, Nigeria

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Giusti (VIAF: 90348762)
Archbishop Giuseppe Giusti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePisa, Archdiocese of Pisa
Ordained BishopS. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 120, and Page 416
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1867, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017