Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godfrey Igwebuike Onah

Bishop of Nsukka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1956 BornImilike Ani
28 Jul 198427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Enugu, Nigeria
19 Nov 199034.3IncardinatedPriest of Nsukka, Nigeria
13 Apr 201356.7AppointedBishop of Nsukka, Nigeria
4 Jul 201356.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nsukka, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Godfrey Igwebuike Onah:
Bishop Godfrey Igwebuike Onah (born ) Bishop of Nsukka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nsukka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013
  • ob: CB, 6 May 2013
  • c2: CB, 9 Jun 2013
  • c3+: CB, 4 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013