Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Valerian Maduka Okeke

Archbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1953 Born
11 Jul 198127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Onitsha, Nigeria
9 Nov 200148.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
9 Feb 200248.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
1 Sep 200349.8SucceededArchbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Valerian Maduka Okeke
Archbishop Valerian Maduka Okeke (born ) Archbishop of Onitsha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUnudioka

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Onitsha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 May 2017