Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Chidi Isizoh

Bishop of Aguleri, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1956 Born
23 Dec 198428.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Onitsha, Nigeria
28 Sep 198529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Onitsha, Nigeria
6 Feb 201559.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
6 Feb 201559.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Legia
1 May 201559.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Legia
12 Feb 202367.0AppointedBishop of Aguleri, Nigeria
17 Mar 202367.1InstalledBishop of Aguleri, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Denis Chidi Isizoh
(VIAF: 71216580; WikiData: Q19277970)
Bishop Denis Chidi Isizoh (born ) Bishop of Aguleri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOgbunike, Archdiocese of Onitsha
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Near, Most Holy Trinity, Cathedral Basilica, Onitsha, Archdiocese of Onitsha

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aguleri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2015
  • ob: CB, 24 Feb 2015
  • c23: CB, 2 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,486
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 12 Feb 2023