Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Parisot, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cotonou

Titular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1885BornBrognon, France
17 Oct 190924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
11 Mar 193549.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dahomey, Benin
11 Mar 193549.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacapae
28 Oct 193550.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacapae
14 Sep 195570.1AppointedArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
5 Jan 196074.4RetiredArchbishop of Cotonou, Benin
5 Jan 196074.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chersonesus in Zechia
21 Apr 196074.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cotonou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Louis Parisot:
Archbishop Louis Parisot S.M.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cotonou

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015