Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Person, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio

Titular Bishop of Paraetonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1890Born
11 Jul 192029.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
9 Dec 193545.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio
9 Dec 193545.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Paraetonium
10 May 193645.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paraetonium
8 Jul 193847.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio

MicroData Summary for François Person
Bishop François Person S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlouharnel, France

  • a priest for 17.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast